THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/07/2018 12:10:13 PM

Warbeck, Paul Julius (CPSO#: 54361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Park Ave & Lazelle Medical Clinic
4th Flr--4634 Park Ave
Terrace, BC
V8G 1V7
Terrace BC  V8G 1V7
Phone: 250-615-5040
Fax: 250-615-5035
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Nipigon Family Health Clinic
125 Hogan Road
Nipigon, ON
P0T 2J0
Nipigon ON  P0T 2J0
Canada
Phone: 807-887-5252
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JULIUS WARBECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARBECK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1993