THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 21/06/2018 10:30:36 AM

Clarke, Julie Lynn (CPSO#: 56742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
460 Springbank Dr
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 672-0060
Fax: (519) 661-0597
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Clarke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Clarke ( CPSO# 56742 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone Number: (519) 672-0060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE LYNN CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1987