THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/08/2018 8:07:52 PM

Hutchison, Carolyn Rose (CPSO#: 57372)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018