THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/06/2018 5:03:49 PM

Zheng, Xin-Hua (CPSO#: 57865)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Feb 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Peking Union Medical University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 07 Feb 1989
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 1989