THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 14/08/2018 11:16:03 PM

Beauregard, Liette (CPSO#: 59101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C M P A - C P 8225
S U C C T
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7
Phone: (800) 267-6522
Fax: (877) 763-1300
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIETTE BEAUREGARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUREGARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1989