THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/08/2018 9:23:10 AM

Le Gras, Marc David (CPSO#: 60058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pediatric Cardiology Ctr of Oregon
300 North Graham
Suite 250
Portland OR  97227-1604
United States
Phone: (503) 280-3418
Fax: (503) 284-7885

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Oregon
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC DAVID LE GRAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE GRAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1989