THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/02/2019 7:44:30 PM

Hengel, Richard Lowell (CPSO#: 60436)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Nov 1991