THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 24/09/2018 5:56:38 PM

Nebbia, Stephan Patrick (CPSO#: 61355)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:College of Med & Dentistry of New Jersey, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993