THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/11/2018 11:48:43 AM

Schwab-Lang, Monika Eva (CPSO#: 62112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite F
960 Cumberland Avenue
Burlington ON  L7N 3J6
Phone: (905) 681-5383
Fax: (905) 681-5320
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monika Schwab-Lang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schwab-Lang ( CPSO# 62112 )

Business Address:
Suite F
960 Cumberland Avenue
Burlington ON  L7N 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 681-5383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIKA EVA SCHWAB-LANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWAB-LANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1991