THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/08/2018 1:13:49 PM

Kortas, Claude (CPSO#: 62165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Cluj, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Room A2 342
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8287
Fax: (519) 685-8224
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CMG Kortas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Papukna ( CPSO# 63190 )
Dr. C. Kortas ( CPSO# 62165 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
Room A2-342
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8282

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDE KORTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORTAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1990