THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/10/2018 4:30:24 AM

England, Deirdre Prudence (CPSO#: 62270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Carlos, Deirdre Prudence (used until: 05 Jun 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21020
175 hampton road
quispamsis
st john NB  E2E 4Z4
Phone: (506) 847-1232

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: PO Box 21031 175 Old Hampton Road Quispamsis, New Brunswick E2E 4Z4
Date Received: 23 Sep 2009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEIRDRE PRUDENCE ENGLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008