THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 12/11/2018 10:24:48 PM

Lemke, Marvin Graham (CPSO#: 62708)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Alberta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Sep 1993