THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 19/07/2018 9:54:36 AM

Chan, Bok Man (CPSO#: 63056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of London, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000 Ext. 5071
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bok Man Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chan ( CPSO# 63056 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5071

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Jul 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 16 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 16 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 16, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Bok Man Chan in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chan to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                          DR. BOK MAN CHAN
                                                ("Dr. Chan")
                  
                                                       to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                                (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Chan, certificate of registration number 63056, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that the College received information from the
                  NMS and initiated an investigation bearing File Number 7215557 (the
                  "Investigation") into whether I failed to maintain the standard of
                  practice of the profession and/or am incompetent in my prescribing of
                  controlled substances, including narcotics.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective upon the date I sign it (the "Effective Date").

            (5)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that the provisions of this Undertaking are
                  applicable to my prescribing of Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                  Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All
                  other Monitored Drugs for chronic pain, and excludes those prescribed or
                  administered by me for procedural sedation, for obstetrical procedures,
                  pre-operatively, intra-operatively, or in the post-anesthesia care unit.

            (6)   I, Dr. Chan, shall keep a Log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                  (i)   the date of the appointment;
                  (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                  (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction, number of
                        tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                  (iv)  the clinical indication;
                  (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or different
                        dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the patient (Y/N); 
                  (vi)  Dr. Chan's signature;
                  (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable, as set
                        out below); and
                  (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set out
                        below).
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                  corresponding patient chart.

            (8)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor"),
                        for a minimum of six (6) months on the terms set out below (the
                        "Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to meet with my Clinical Supervisor at least
                        once every three (3) months to discuss the Clinical Supervisor's
                        review of:
                  
                        i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review,
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review there are
                              not 15 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I have
                              prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                              Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All
                              other Monitored Drugs , then the charts of all patients
                              listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's
                              prior review; and
                  
                        ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for:
                  
                              1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                              2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                              3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                    Substances and All other Monitored Drugs where the
                                    patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                                    Narcotic Preparation,
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review there are
                              not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I have
                              initiated a new prescription for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                              Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                              Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs where the
                              patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or Narcotic
                              Preparation, then the charts of all patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor must sign and
                        date the Prescribing Log to confirm the charts that the Clinical
                        Supervisor has reviewed and discussed with me.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor will provide
                        a report to the College at least once every three (3) months.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that after a minimum of six (6) months, if
                        the Clinical Supervisor is satisfied that I have the necessary
                        knowledge, skills and judgment to practice without supervision, the
                        Clinical Supervisor may recommend to the College that the Clinical
                        Supervision cease. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical
                        Supervision will only cease upon recommendation of the Clinical
                        Supervisor and approval by the College.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor.  In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor will, at
                        a minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "F";
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        Location approved by the College;
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that all charts reviewed shall be
                        independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the
                        educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F" to
                        my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report of the medical inspector dated January 10, 2018, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        reasonable recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but
                        not limited to, any reasonable recommended practice improvements
                        and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (m)   I, Dr. Chan, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (8)(k) and/or (l)
                        above, I will cease prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances and All other Monitored Drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (n)   I, Dr. Chan, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                        Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs as a result of section (8)(m) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
            (9)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Schedule "F",
                        including but not limited to, the following elements of
                        professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safe
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                  
                        (ii)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor the following
                              resources:
                  
                              1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-
                                    Drugs;
                  
                              2.    2018 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html;
                  
                              3.    CMPA advice regarding preventing the misuse of opioids
                                    https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids;
                  
                              4.    the Centre for Effective Practice Management of Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain Tool https://thewellhealth.ca/cncp;and 
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                        specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                        participant assessment reports where available, within one (1)
                        month of completion of each element. I acknowledge that the College
                        will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed each element of the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (10)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        Clinical Supervision set out under section 8 of the Undertaking has
                        ceased, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Reassessment").

                  (b)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, an interview
                        of me, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under the terms of this Undertaking 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and that the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        Location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                        (10) business days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at
                        that Location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and Schedule "H",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (17)  I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with the section above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring
                        System about Dr. Chan's prescribing of controlled substances,
                        including narcotics.
                        Based on the information received, the College conducted an
                        investigation into whether Dr. Chan failed to maintain the standard
                        of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his
                        prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.  As a
                        result of the investigation:
                  
                        *     Dr. Chan's prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic
                              preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other
                              targeted substances, and other monitored drugs for chronic
                              pain will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable
                              to the College for minimum of six (6) months. 
                  
                        *     Dr. Chan will engage in professional education in the
                              prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics for
                              chronic pain.
                  
                        *     Following the professional education and period of
                              supervision, Dr. Chan's prescribing of controlled substances,
                              including narcotics, for chronic pain will be re-assessed by
                              an assessor selected by the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Chan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Chan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Chan, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or 
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Bok Man Chan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 16, 2018:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Chan’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Chan failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Chan’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs for chronic pain will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum of six (6) months.

- Dr. Chan will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics for chronic pain.

- Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Chan’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, for chronic pain will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.