THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 25/09/2018 8:32:48 PM

Taras, Lisa Helene (CPSO#: 63622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PSOHP (Occupational Health Clinic)
Health Canada
12th Floor
171 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: (855) 312-1500
Fax: (613) 990-9397
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA HELENE TARAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1992