THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/02/2019 8:04:12 PM

Gujrathi, Deven Subhash (CPSO#: 63739)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 17 Nov 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 17 Nov 1994