THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 10/12/2018 3:14:41 AM

Bordeleau, Louise Jeannine (CPSO#: 63785)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9711 Ext. 63123
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Louise Bordeleau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bordeleau ( CPSO# 63785 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISE JEANNINE BORDELEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORDELEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 06 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992