THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/07/2018 3:08:46 AM

Tran, Preston Thien Phuoc (CPSO#: 64148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Group
390 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan ON  L4J 6X3
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Woodbridge Urgent Care Centre
4000 Highway 7, unit 2
Vaughan ON  L4L 8Z2
Canada
Phone: (905) 851-3777
Fax: (905) 851-0682
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

900 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1A5
Canada
Phone: (647) 722-2370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Preston Tran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tran ( CPSO# 64148 )

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Group
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 747-0008

Business Address:
900 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 746-9009

Business Address:
4000 Highway 7
Suite 2
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8Z2
Phone Number: (905) 851-5769

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRESTON THIEN PHUOC TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992