THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/11/2018 3:25:44 PM

Prins, Claire Ann (CPSO#: 65364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: Robertson, Claire Ann (used until: 01 Nov 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Howard Mutual Medical Centre
20129 Erie Street South,
P.O. Box 667
Ridgetown ON  N0P 2C0
Phone: (519) 674-2600
Fax: (866) 539-6714
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Prins ( CPSO# 65364 )
Dr. L. Prins ( CPSO# 65363 )

Business Address:
20129 Erie Street South
Ridgetown ON  N0P 2C0
Phone Number: (519) 674-2600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAIRE ANN PRINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1993