THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 21/06/2018 6:16:01 AM

Petrovic, Danica (CPSO#: 65570)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1998