THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 21/06/2018 12:24:23 PM

Chua, Hock Leng (CPSO#: 66268)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Dec 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Western Australia, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Jan 1994
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 1993