THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/08/2018 1:13:39 PM

Hsieh, Eugene Ta-Kuang (CPSO#: 68251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Anatomic Pathology
Room E4-16
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4600
Fax: (416) 480-4271
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eugene Hsieh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hsieh ( CPSO# 68251 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomic Pathology
Room E4-16
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGENE TA-KUANG HSIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSIEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998