THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/12/2018 4:35:56 PM

Al-Gamdi, Khalid Ali (CPSO#: 68472)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 13 Jul 1995
Resident 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 14 Jul 1996
Resident 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 14 Jul 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998