THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/06/2018 1:37:15 AM

Lipscombe, Jennifer Bridgette (CPSO#: 70248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-1104
Fax: (905) 272-1105
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Lipscombe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipscombe ( CPSO# 70248 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-1104

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER BRIDGETTE LIPSCOMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPSCOMBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2000