THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 12/11/2018 9:29:51 PM

Witty, Melissa Jane (CPSO#: 70406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 792-3333
Fax: (705) 728-4120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Witty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Witty ( CPSO# 70406 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-3333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA JANE WITTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1998