THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/02/2019 9:27:17 PM

Wollin, Timothy Armin (CPSO#: 70871)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 08 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1996 to 01 Sep 1997
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 1999