THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/02/2019 9:37:34 PM

Wong, Roger Yiu-Ming (CPSO#: 70989)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Apr 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Apr 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Feb 1997 to 04 Apr 1997
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Apr 1997 to 25 Apr 1997
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 1997