THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/08/2018 11:46:40 PM

Voduc, Nha (CPSO#: 71209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Box 211
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8198
Fax: (613) 737-8537
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nha Voduc, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Voduc ( CPSO# 71209 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Box 211
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1N 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8198

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NHA VODUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VODUC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2002