THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 26/09/2018 4:40:56 AM

Mundi, Christina G (CPSO#: 71323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RCMP Headquarters
Occupational Health and Safety Svcs
M5, 1st Floor, Room 410
Mailstop 34
Ottawa ON  K1A 0R2
Phone: (613) 843-3310
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Mundi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mundi ( CPSO# 71323 )

Business Address:
HQ Occupational Health and Safety Services
Room 410 Mailstop 34
M5 1st Floor
73 Laskin Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0R2
Phone Number: (613) 843-3310

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA G MUNDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999