THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/10/2018 3:30:47 PM

Bhardwaj, Divya (CPSO#: 71958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Rajasthan University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 56576
Fax: (905) 494-6577
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Divya Bhardwaj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bhardwaj ( CPSO# 71958 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIVYA BHARDWAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARDWAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2005