THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 21/06/2018 10:26:04 AM

Polukhin, Elena (CPSO#: 73228)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuban Medical Institute, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Polyclinic Family and
Specialty Medicine
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 12 Jan 1999
Research Fellows - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999