THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/10/2018 5:30:22 AM

Sidhu, Kuldeep Singh (CPSO#: 73328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6165
Fax: (416) 756-6151
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
Fax: (905) 521-7051
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kuldeep Sidhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sidhu ( CPSO# 73328 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
General Site
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6165

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KULDEEP SINGH SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1999