THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 14/08/2018 6:38:46 AM

Polanski, Annette Carissima (CPSO#: 73651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8 RICHMOND PARK DRIVE
Napanee ON  K7R2B5
Canada
Phone: 6133543301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annette Polanski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Polanski ( CPSO# 73651 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNETTE CARISSIMA POLANSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLANSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004