THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 24/06/2018 12:43:18 PM

Murphy, Kathleen Patricia (CPSO#: 74351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Science Center
300 Prince Philip Drive
St. John's NL  A1B 2G6
Phone: (709) 777-6300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Shore Health Network Blind River

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN PATRICIA MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Oct 1999 to 10 Nov 1999
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2000 to 30 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Nov 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2016