THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/07/2018 6:52:12 AM

Jacyk, William Richard (CPSO#: 74369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
125 St George Street
Fergus ON  N1M 1H8
Phone: (519)830-1452
Fax: (519)846-2331
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Jacyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Jacyk ( CPSO# 74369 )

Business Address:
3571 Muskoka Road 169
Bala ON  P0C 1A0
Phone Number: (705) 762-5501

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Mar 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM RICHARD JACYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACYK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Oct 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2000