THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 10/12/2018 12:21:38 PM

Varlese, Fabio (CPSO#: 74397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Rome, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
North York ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2613
Fax: (416) 785-2863
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 2000 east Office
55 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3L2
Canada
Phone: (416) 849-5555
Fax: (416) 849-5551
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Varlese Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2013


Corporation Name: F. Varlese Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Varlese ( CPSO# 74397 )

Business Address:
Suite 2000, East Office
55 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3L2
Phone Number: (416) 849-5555

Business Address:
Baycrest Hospital
Unit 7W-40
3560 Bathurst Street
North York ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 19 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FABIO VARLESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARLESE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Nov 1999 to 02 Dec 1999
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2003