THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/11/2018 12:31:45 PM

Gelber, Stephen Geoffrey (CPSO#: 74896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mental Health Department
North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West Room 103
North York ON  M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 633-9420 Ext. 6678
Fax: (416) 635-2428
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
General Division
Mental Health Department
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Gelber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gelber ( CPSO# 74896 )

Business Address:
6100 Belgrave Road
Mississauga ON  L5R 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 624-9115

Business Address:
Mental Health Department
North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West Room South 1-103
North York ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 633-9420

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
General Division
Mental Health Department
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6655

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN GEOFFREY GELBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2005