THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/11/2018 12:03:05 PM

Chelius, Amanda Jane (CPSO#: 75113)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Tooley, Amanda Jane (used until: 22 Aug 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002