THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 25/09/2018 8:32:52 PM

Yakoub, Elvira (CPSO#: 75273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English, Italian

Education:Universiteti i Tiranes, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
208 - 2425 Tecumseh Road
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 258-2778
Fax: (519) 258-3102
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 200
2462 Howard
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-4143
Fax: (519) 258-4456
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Yakoub Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yakoub ( CPSO# 75273 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N9W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 258-2778

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Aug 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELVIRA YAKOUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAKOUB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2002