THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/11/2018 6:48:56 AM

Osinga, Christopher John (CPSO#: 75371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4924
Fax: (905) 721-6679
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Osinga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Osinga ( CPSO# 75371 )

Business Address:
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4924

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN OSINGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSINGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000