THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/11/2018 11:26:18 AM

Small, Allison Mary (CPSO#: 76248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
203 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 N
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-3005
Fax: (705) 789-3001
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allison Small Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Small ( CPSO# 76248 )

Business Address:
203 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-3005

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON MARY SMALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2003