THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/08/2018 9:20:56 PM

Malik, Rajnish Neesh (CPSO#: 76758)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Malik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 19 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: Dauphin Regional Health Centre, Department of Radiology, 625 3rd Street Southwest, Dauphin, MB, R7N 1R7
Date Received: 07 Jun 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 17 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2016