THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/07/2018 10:12:17 AM

Trinh, Hang Bich (CPSO#: 77227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
3033 Palstan Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4E7
Phone: (905) 270-4567
Fax: (905) 270-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hang Bich Trinh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bui ( CPSO# 83037 )
Dr. H. Trinh ( CPSO# 77227 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
3033 Palstan Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4E7
Phone Number: (905) 270-4567


Corporation Name: Thuc Thuan Bui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bui ( CPSO# 83037 )
Dr. H. Trinh ( CPSO# 77227 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
3033 Palstan Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4E7
Phone Number: (905) 270-4567

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Feb 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANG BICH TRINH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 07 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2004