THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 10/12/2018 3:14:38 AM

Mundenchira, Amitha Jocie (CPSO#: 78013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LAKESHORE WOODS MEDICAL CLINIC
3420 REBECCA STREET
UNIT 6 & 7
Oakville ON  L6L 6W2
Phone: 905-847-2525
Fax: 905-847-4447
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI The Doctor's Office
Six Points Plaza
5230 Dundas Street W
Etobicoke ON  M9B1A8
Canada
Phone: 416-234-8668
Fax: 416-234-8720
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MCI The Doctor's Office
Mississauga West
2575 Dundas St W, Unit #15
Mississauga ON  L5K 2M6
Canada
Phone: 905-820-3310
Fax: 905-820-3312
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMITHA JOCIE MUNDENCHIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNDENCHIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2004