THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/10/2018 4:28:02 AM

Samman, Taha Adnan Taha (CPSO#: 78420)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2003