THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/10/2018 4:29:51 AM

Dubcenco, Elena (CPSO#: 78719)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010