THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/10/2018 3:01:56 PM

Quinn, Andrew Patrick (CPSO#: 79522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
89 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 749-7770
Fax: (416) 749-9689
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew P. Quinn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Quinn ( CPSO# 79522 )

Business Address:
Suite 216
89 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 749-7770

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW PATRICK QUINN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUINN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008