THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/11/2018 12:45:31 PM

Basappa, Naveen Shanker (CPSO#: 79625)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007