THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 13/12/2018 4:50:35 AM

Lafontaine, Isabelle (CPSO#: 80256)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012