THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 12/11/2018 9:16:05 PM

Bozorgzadeh, Minoo (CPSO#: 80371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dixie X Ray Associate
8333 Weston Rd. Columbus Medical Bl
Suite #B1
Vaughan ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 850-7478
Fax: (905) 850-6934
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bozorgzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bozorgzadeh ( CPSO# 80371 )

Business Address:
Dixie X Ray Associate
Suite B-1
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 850-7478

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINOO BOZORGZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOZORGZADEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2008