THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/08/2018 9:33:13 PM

Mukhopadhyay, Amartya (CPSO#: 80514)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calcutta, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 23 May 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 May 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004